Burke et al v. Osness et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Burke and Josiah Burke
Defendant: Dallas Cranford, TF Construction, Liberty Environmental, LLC, Tom Ferguson, Dale Osness and Brian Osness
Case Number: 1:2018cv00144
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon T. Dyre on behalf of Brian Osness, Dale Osness (Dyre, Jon)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Brian Osness, Dale Osness. (Harkins, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Burke, Josiah Burke. Tom Ferguson served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Stinson, Laurence)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/7/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/31/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/7/2019. Pretrial Conference Call set for 1/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/30/2018. (EMH)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Burke, Josiah Burke. Dallas Cranford served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Stinson, Laurence)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josiah Burke. Brian Osness served on 10/14/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Dale Osness served on 10/14/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Stinson, Laurence)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Originals with copy complaint mailed to attorney Laurence W. Stinson for service) (EMH) Modified on 10/1/2018 mailed to Cody law office from cover letter directing mail to be sent to that address (EMH).
October 1, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number MTX100015547. (EMH)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Brian Osness, Dale Osness, Tom Ferguson individually and as agent for TF Construction, Dallas Cranford individually and as agent for Liberty Environmental, LLC, filed by plaintiff's Josiah Burke. (1) Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke et al v. Osness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Cranford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TF Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Environmental, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Osness
Represented By: Jon T. Dyre
Represented By: John W Harkins, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Osness
Represented By: Jon T. Dyre
Represented By: John W Harkins, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Burke
Represented By: Laurence W. Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josiah Burke
Represented By: Laurence W. Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?