Harmon v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: John H. Harmon, II
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00145
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Sent to counsel Victoria L. Francis, Erin F. Highland, and John E. Seidlitz, Jr. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/17/2018. (JDR)
November 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin F. Highland on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Highland, Erin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (JDR)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of Service) (Copies conventionally mailed to the Acting Commissioner of SSA, US Attorney General and US Attorney as directed in the Order.) (JDR)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by John H. Harmon, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed summons, #3 Proposed summons, #4 Proposed summons) (JEC) Modified on 10/3/2018: Order granting IFP motion entered and Complaint is deemed filed. NEF regenerated. (JDR).
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff John H. Harmon, II Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JEC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JEC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. Harmon, II
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Erin F. Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?