Avitus, Inc. v. Scoobeez, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Avitus, Inc.
Defendant: Shahan Ohanessian, Scoobeez Global, Inc., Scoobeez, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00146
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Avitus, Inc.. (Wagner, David)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Doug James on behalf of Shahan Ohanessian, Scoobeez Global, Inc., Scoobeez, Inc. (James, Doug)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Sent to counsel David M. Wagner, and Adam J. Tunning Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/17/2018. (JDR)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Shahan Ohanessian, Scoobeez Global, Inc., Scoobeez, Inc.. (Tunning, Adam)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Adam J. Tunning appearing for Defendants Shahan Ohanessian, Scoobeez Global, Inc., Scoobeez, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Tunning, Adam)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Avitus, Inc.. (Wagner, David)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shahan Ohanessian, Scoobeez Global, Inc., Scoobeez, Inc. (originals back to runner) (AEC)
October 3, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2203558. (EMH)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Scoobeez, Inc., Shahan Ohanessian, Scoobeez Global, Inc., and John Does 1-10, filed by Avitus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Professional Employer Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-July 20, 2018 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3-August 27, 2018 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4-September 20, 2018 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 Exhibit Personal Guaranty, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avitus, Inc. v. Scoobeez, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahan Ohanessian
Represented By: Doug James
Represented By: Adam J. Tunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scoobeez Global, Inc.
Represented By: Doug James
Represented By: Adam J. Tunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scoobeez, Inc.
Represented By: Doug James
Represented By: Adam J. Tunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avitus, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?