Bull Mountain Sanitation, LLC. v. Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Bull Mountain Sanitation, LLC.
Defendant: Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C. and Bayside Disposal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00147
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 18 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Bull Mountain Sanitation, LLC.. (Dugger, Tyler)
December 6, 2018 Filing 17 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Bull Mountain Sanitation, LLC.. (Dugger, Tyler)
December 6, 2018 Filing 16 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C., Bayside Disposal, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
December 6, 2018 Filing 15 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C., Bayside Disposal, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings/ Responses due by 12/14/2018. Replies due by 12/28/2018. Motions ripe 12/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/30/2018. (JDR)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Tyler T. Dugger appearing for Plaintiff Bull Mountain Sanitation, LLC. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Dugger, Tyler)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C., Bayside Disposal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Petition for Judicial Review) (McClafferty, Brianne)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Brianne C. McClafferty appearing for Defendants Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C., Bayside Disposal, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (McClafferty, Brianne)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/6/2018. (JDR)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C., Bayside Disposal, Inc., filed by Bull Mountain Sanitation, LLC.. (JDR)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT FILE: DV-11-2018-61-BF, MT 14th Judicial District Court, Musselshell County. (Electronic copies.) (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Shane Coleman, Brianne C. McClafferty, Kenneth D. Tolliver, Tyler T. Dugger. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 11/5/2018. (JEC)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/6/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/6/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/6/2018. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 11:30 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/16/2018. (JDR)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayside Disposal, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Republic Services, Inc. for Bayside Disposal, Inc... (McClafferty, Brianne)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Bayside Disposal, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Glenda Bradshaw by Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C., Bayside Disposal, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
October 9, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2205881. (JEC)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bayside Disposal, Inc., Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C. from Montana 14th Judicial District Court, Musselshell County, case number DV-18-61 filed by Bayside Disposal, Inc., Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Summons issued in State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bull Mountain Sanitation, LLC. v. Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Waste Services of North America, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayside Disposal, Inc.
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bull Mountain Sanitation, LLC.
Represented By: Tyler T. Dugger
Represented By: Kenneth D. Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?