Bank of Colorado v. Berger et al

Appellee: Tami M. Berger and Jeffrey W. Berger
Appellant: Bank of Colorado
In Re: U.S. Bankruptcy Court District of Montana (IP)
Case Number: 1:2018cv00154
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Motion To Dismiss Appeal filed by Bank of Colorado. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/15/2018. (EMH)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 Stipulated Motion To Dismiss Appeal John O'Brien appearing for Appellant Bank of Colorado (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) (O'Brien, John)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott C. Sandberg for Bank of Colorado. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/13/2018. (EMH)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney John O'Brien. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/13/2018. (EMH)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION Scott Sandberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2222129.) Geoffrey R. Keller appearing for Appellant Bank of Colorado (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Scott Sandberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order Admit Pro Hac Vice Sandberg) (Keller, Geoffrey)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION John O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2222102.) Geoffrey R. Keller appearing for Appellant Bank of Colorado (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pro Hac Vice John O'Brien, #2 Text of Proposed Order Grant Pro Hac Vice John O'Brien) (Keller, Geoffrey)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Bank of Colorado (Keller, Geoffrey)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey R. Keller on behalf of Bank of Colorado (Keller, Geoffrey)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order (AMC)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. BAP MT-18-1287 Bankruptcy Court case number 2:18-bk-60032. File received. Appellant Brief due by 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Bank of Colorado Notice of Appeal, #3 BK Order, #4 Transmittal Form, #5 Statement of Election) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Colorado v. Berger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tami M. Berger
Represented By: James A. Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jeffrey W. Berger
Represented By: James A. Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bank of Colorado
Represented By: John O'Brien
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Represented By: Scott C. Sandberg
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: U.S. Bankruptcy Court District of Montana (IP)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?