Root v. Montana Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Root
Defendant: Alex Schroeckenstein, Paul Law and Montana Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2018cv00164
Filed: November 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Montana Department of Corrections. (Haladay, Andres)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Paul Law, Alex Schroeckenstein. (Haladay, Andres)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Andres Haladay appearing for Defendants Paul Law, Montana Department of Corrections, Alex Schroeckenstein Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Haladay, Andres)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andres Haladay on behalf of Paul Law, Montana Department of Corrections, Alex Schroeckenstein (Haladay, Andres)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Paul Law, Montana Department of Corrections, Alex Schroeckenstein. Originals sent via US Mail to plaintiff's counsel. (JEC)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Root re #1 Complaint REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Attachments: #1 Summons DOC, #2 Summons DOC by AG, #3 Summons Law, #4 Summons Stein) (Kelly, Timothy)
November 18, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2224839 (JDR) Modified on 11/19/2018 to correct received date (JDR).
November 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Law, Montana Department of Corrections, Alex Schroeckenstein, filed by Daniel Root. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR) Modified on 11/19/2018 to correct filed date (JDR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Root v. Montana Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Schroeckenstein
Represented By: Andres Haladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Law
Represented By: Andres Haladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Corrections
Represented By: Andres Haladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Root
Represented By: Timothy C. Kelly
Represented By: Kevin S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?