United States of America v. $53,201.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $53,201.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2018cv00171
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Declaration of Publication by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Advertisement Certification Report) (Francis, Victoria)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 USM-285 Executed USM 285 Return Executed on 12-28-2018. (Francis, Victoria)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued. Original warrant placed in USA box for pick up. (JEC)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem Application for Warrant of Arrest In Rem Victoria L. Francis appearing for Plaintiff United States of America Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Warrant for Arrest In Rem) (Francis, Victoria)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Francis, Victoria)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $53,201.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $53,201.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $53,201.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?