Talen Montana Retirement Plan et al v. PPL Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Talen Montana Retirement Plan and Talen Energy Marketing, LLC
Defendant: Stuart E. Graham, John W. Conway, Craig A. Rogerson, Louise K. Goeser, Rodney C. Adkins, PPL Capital Funding Inc., Steven G. Elliott, William H. Spence, PPL Energy Funding Corp., Paul A. Farr, Peter J. Simonich, Mark F. Wilten, Philip G. Cox, Natica von Althann, DOES 1-50, Raja Rajamannar, Frederick M. Bernthal, PPL Electric Utilities Corp., Stuart Heydt, PPL Corporation, Keith H. Williamson and Armando Zagalo de Lima
Case Number: 1:2018cv00174
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 STIPULATION for Written Discovery on Factual Bases for Remand and Extension of Time for Briefing on Remand Motion. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/6/2019. (EMH)
February 5, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Written Discovery on Factual Bases for Remand and Extension of Time for Briefing on Remand Motion by PPL Capital Funding Inc., PPL Corporation, PPL Electric Utilities Corp., PPL Energy Funding Corp., Peter J. Simonich, Mark F. Wilten. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Singer, Tom) Modified on 2/6/2019 to make into motion event (EMH).
January 24, 2019 Remark: PHV attorney Joshua Seifert is now a registered e-filer and can receive electronic notice in this case. (EMH)
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Remand filed by Talen Energy Marketing, LLC, Talen Montana Retirement Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Aarstad v BNSF, #2 Exhibit Renee Garin Declaration, #3 Exhibit Derek James Declaration, #4 Exhibit Tyler Schwartz Declaration, #5 Exhibit Troy Hantla Declaration, #6 Exhibit Henry Gonzales Declaration) (Sterup, Robert)
January 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand Robert L. Sterup appearing for Plaintiffs Talen Energy Marketing, LLC, Talen Montana Retirement Plan (Sterup, Robert)
January 23, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul A. Farr, PPL Capital Funding Inc., PPL Corporation, PPL Electric Utilities Corp., PPL Energy Funding Corp., Peter J. Simonich, Mark F. Wilten, filed by Talen Montana Retirement Plan, Talen Energy Marketing, LLC. (Sterup, Robert)
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Talen Energy Marketing, LLC, Talen Montana Retirement Plan (Sterup, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER FROM CLERK notifying Pro Hac Vice attorney to register. (Copy mailed to atty along with copy of the order) (AMC)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Joshua L. Seifert. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/18/2019. (AMC)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Joshua L. Seifert to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2251787.) Casey Heitz appearing for Defendant Paul A. Farr (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua L. Seifert in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Heitz, Casey)
January 10, 2019 Set Deadlines: Motion for Remand due by 1/23/2019. (EMH)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Order to set date for remand motion. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 1/9/2019. (EMH)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to set date for remand motion Robert L. Sterup appearing for Plaintiffs Talen Energy Marketing, LLC, Talen Montana Retirement Plan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sterup, Robert)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 STATE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Talen Montana Retirement Plan and Talen Energy Marketing, LLC and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated. (EMH)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT DOCUMENTS received from Montana Sixteenth Judicial District Court, Rosebud County, cause number DV 18-56. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Receipt) (Originals documents placed in brown expando on OPEN Civil case shelf in clerks office) (Transfer receipt signed and returned to Rosebud County Clerks office). (EMH)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Pursuant to the Stipulation #7 filed and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the preliminary pretrial conference call set for 2/20/2019 and associated deadlines are VACATED. Defendant's responsive pleadings shall be due 14 days after the Court's ruling on the motion for remand; and Merits discovery is stayed until the Court rules on the motion for remand and any jurisdictional motions. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/18/2018. (EMH)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time, to Vacate Preliminary Pretrial Conference, and to Stay Merits Discovery by Rodney C. Adkins, Natica von Althann, Frederick M. Bernthal, John W. Conway, Philip G. Cox, Steven G. Elliott, Louise K. Goeser, Stuart E. Graham, Stuart Heydt, PPL Capital Funding Inc., PPL Corporation, PPL Electric Utilities Corp., PPL Energy Funding Corp., Raja Rajamannar, Craig A. Rogerson, Peter J. Simonich, William H. Spence, Keith H. Williamson, Mark F. Wilten, Armando Zagalo de Lima. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Singer, Tom)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CALL ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/13/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/6/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/13/2019. Pretrial Conference Call set for 2/20/2019 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/11/2018. (EMH)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PPL Energy Funding Corp. identifying Corporate Parent PPL Corporation for PPL Energy Funding Corp... (Singer, Tom)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PPL Electric Utilities Corp. identifying Corporate Parent PPL Corporation for PPL Electric Utilities Corp... (Singer, Tom)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PPL Capital Funding Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PPL Corporation for PPL Capital Funding Inc... (Singer, Tom)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PPL Corporation. (Singer, Tom)
December 10, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2235137. (EMH)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (CONDEMNATION) from Sixteenth Judicial Court, Rosebud County, Montana, case number DV 18-56., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Notices of Lawsuit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talen Montana Retirement Plan et al v. PPL Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart E. Graham
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Conway
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig A. Rogerson
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise K. Goeser
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney C. Adkins
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPL Capital Funding Inc.
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven G. Elliott
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Spence
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPL Energy Funding Corp.
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Farr
Represented By: Mark D. Parker
Represented By: Casey Heitz
Represented By: Joshua L. Seifert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Simonich
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark F. Wilten
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip G. Cox
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natica von Althann
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raja Rajamannar
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick M. Bernthal
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPL Electric Utilities Corp.
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Heydt
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPL Corporation
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith H. Williamson
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Zagalo de Lima
Represented By: Tom Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Griffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talen Montana Retirement Plan
Represented By: Robert L. Sterup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talen Energy Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Sterup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?