Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association v. QBE Insurance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association and Cumberland Hill Townhome Association
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation, John Does I-V and Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00178
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/21/2019. Order to follow. (WDB)
February 7, 2019 Filing 25 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association. (Frickle, Roger)
February 7, 2019 Filing 24 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association. (Frickle, Roger)
February 7, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association. (Frickle, Roger)
February 7, 2019 Filing 22 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation. (Wright, John)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. All counsel shall appear by telephone at the February 21, 2019 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. (See Order) Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/29/2019. (JDR)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion Court enter an order permitting counsel Seth I. Weinstein to appear telephonically at conference set for 2-21-19 at 11:00 a.m. (See Order for dial-in information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/28/2019. (JDR)
January 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. (Weinstein, Seth)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION Court enter an order permitting counsel Seth I. Weinstein to appear telephonically at conference set for 2-21-19 at 11:00 a.m. Seth Weinstein appearing for Defendants Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation (Weinstein, Seth)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by QBE Insurance Corporation (Weinstein, Seth)
January 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan added. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan and Judge Susan P. Watters no longer assigned to case. (JDR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to U. S. Magistrate Judge. (JDR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc., John Does I-V, QBE Insurance Corporation, filed by Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association. (JDR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 STATE COURT FILE: DV-56-2018-1589-BC, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk of Court mailed to PHV attorney Seth Weinstein notifying him of CM/ECF registration requirements. (JDR)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Seth Weinstein). Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 1/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/10/2019. (JDR)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/10/2019. (JDR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference Roger W. Frickle appearing for Plaintiff Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association, Counter Defendant Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Frickle, Roger)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Seth Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2245911.) James R. Halverson appearing for Defendants Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, Counter Claimants Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Weinstein Affidavit) (Halverson, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, by Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association. (Frickle, Roger)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel James R. Halverson, Thomas Mahlen, A. Clifford Edwards, Roger W. Frickle, John William Edwards. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 1/14/2019. (JEC)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/7/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/7/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/7/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/27/2018. (AEC)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Halverson, James)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.. (Halverson, James)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association by QBE Insurance Corporation, Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Policy) (Halverson, James)
December 26, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2241623 (JDR)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QBE Insurance Corporation, Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-18-1589., filed by QBE Insurance Corporation, Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association v. QBE Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: James R. Halverson
Represented By: Thomas Mahlen
Represented By: John Larrimore Wright
Represented By: Seth Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Halverson
Represented By: Thomas Mahlen
Represented By: John Larrimore Wright
Represented By: Seth Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cumberland Hill Homeowners' Association
Represented By: Roger W. Frickle
Represented By: A. Clifford Edwards
Represented By: John William Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cumberland Hill Townhome Association
Represented By: Roger W. Frickle
Represented By: A. Clifford Edwards
Represented By: John William Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?