First Interstate BancSystem, Inc. et al v. Not Afraid et al

Plaintiff: First Interstate Bank and First Interstate BancSystem, Inc.
Defendant: Rudolph Knute Old Crow, Shawn Back Bone, Crow Tribe of Indians, Ronald Arneson, Alvin Not Afraid, Jr., Carlson Goes Ahead and Frank White Clay
Case Number: 1:2019cv00010
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 IT IS ORDERED that because this Court lacks jurisdiction pursuant to the federal interpleader statute, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the preliminiary injunction hearing set for 2/14/2019 IS VACATED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/14/2019. (AMC)
February 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by First Interstate BancSystem, Inc., First Interstate Bank (to Court in Anticipation of Preliminary Injunction Hearing) (Sullivan, John)
February 9, 2019 Filing 18 Second MOTION to Quash Thor A. Hoyte appearing for Defendant Frank White Clay Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit second affidavit of White Clay) (Hoyte, Thor)
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by First Interstate BancSystem, Inc., First Interstate Bank re #14 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Notice to Court in Response to Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order) (Sullivan, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 Joinder in MOTION re #15 MOTION to Quash TRO . (Towe, Thomas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Quash TRO Thor A. Hoyte appearing for Defendant Frank White Clay Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit affidavit in opp to TRO) (Hoyte, Thor)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Order granting #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ronald Arneson, Crow Tribe of Indians, Rudolph Knute Old Crow, Alvin Not Afraid, Jr. A hearing set on preliminary injunction is scheduled for 2/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/8/2019. (EMH)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Dion Killsback, Thomas E. Towe, Shane Coleman, John D. Sullivan, Thor A. Hoyte. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/25/2019. (JEC)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thor A. Hoyte on behalf of Frank White Clay (Hoyte, Thor)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Towe on behalf of Shawn Back Bone (Towe, Thomas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Towe on behalf of Carlson Goes Ahead (Towe, Thomas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Interstate BancSystem, Inc., First Interstate Bank. Frank White Clay waiver sent on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Sullivan, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Interstate BancSystem, Inc., First Interstate Bank. Ronald Arneson waiver sent on 2/5/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Crow Tribe of Indians waiver sent on 2/5/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Alvin Not Afraid, Jr waiver sent on 2/5/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Rudolph Knute Old Crow waiver sent on 2/5/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Sullivan, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Dion Killsback appearing for Defendants Ronald Arneson, Crow Tribe of Indians, Alvin Not Afraid, Jr, Rudolph Knute Old Crow Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chairman Not Afraid, #2 Exhibit Crow Annual Budget FY2019, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Killsback, Dion)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dion Killsback on behalf of Ronald Arneson, Crow Tribe of Indians, Alvin Not Afraid, Jr, Rudolph Knute Old Crow (Killsback, Dion)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Interstate BancSystem, Inc., First Interstate Bank. Carlson Goes Ahead waiver sent on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Sullivan, John)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by First Interstate BancSystem, Inc., First Interstate Bank. Shawn Back Bone waiver sent on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Sullivan, John)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Interstate BancSystem, Inc., First Interstate Bank identifying Corporate Parent First Interstate Bancsystem, Inc. for First Interstate BancSystem, Inc., First Interstate Bank.. (Sullivan, John)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ronald Arneson, Shawn Back Bone, Crow Tribe of Indians, Carlson Goes Ahead, Alvin Not Afraid, Jr, Rudolph Knute Old Crow, Frank White Clay. Originals sent via US Mail to plaintiffs counsel. (JEC)
February 1, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2258654. (JEC)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against Ronald Arneson, Shawn Back Bone, Crow Tribe of Indians, Carlson Goes Ahead, Alvin Not Afraid, Jr, Rudolph Knute Old Crow, Frank White Clay, filed by First Interstate BancSystem, Inc., First Interstate Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Interstate BancSystem, Inc. et al v. Not Afraid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph Knute Old Crow
Represented By: Dion Killsback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Back Bone
Represented By: Thomas E. Towe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crow Tribe of Indians
Represented By: Dion Killsback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Arneson
Represented By: Dion Killsback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Not Afraid, Jr.
Represented By: Dion Killsback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlson Goes Ahead
Represented By: Thomas E. Towe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank White Clay
Represented By: Thor A. Hoyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Interstate Bank
Represented By: John D. Sullivan
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Interstate BancSystem, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Sullivan
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?