Design Basics, LLC v. K.W. Signature Homes, Inc.

Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC
Defendant: K.W. Signature Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00013
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Correction: re #13 Notice (Other). The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (JEC)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PRO HAC VICE ORDER by Design Basics, LLC (Twidwell, Kevin) Modified on 3/14/2019 to correct title(JEC).
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 AO 121 Copyright form signed and re-filed by the clerk's office. Counsel has been notified. (JDR)
March 8, 2019 Remark: Pro Hac Vice attorney John LaDue is now a registered efiler and can receive filings electronically. (AMC)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 AO 121 Copyright form transmitted to the U.S. Copyright Office. (Twidwell, Kevin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk of Court mailed to PHV counsel John D. LaDue notifying him of CM/ECF registration requirements. (JEC)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/6/2019. (AEC)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION John LaDue to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2273526.) Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of John LaDue, #2 Certification Under MT Rule, #3 Proposed Order) (Twidwell, Kevin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION UNDER MONTANA RULES OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT 8.5 by Design Basics, LLC (Twidwell, Kevin) Modified on 2/27/2019 to correct title. (JEC).
February 14, 2019 Remark: PHV attorney Sean Quinn is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFS. (JDR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk of Court notifying PHV attorney Sean J. Quinn or CM/ECF registration requirements. (Mailed to attorney Quinn on this date) (JDR)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion Sean J. Quinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/8/2019. (JDR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Sean J. Quinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2262063.) Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Plaintiff Design Basics, LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sean Quinn, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Professional Conduct, #4 Proposed Order) (Twidwell, Kevin)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to K.W. Signature Homes, Inc. Original sent via US Mail to plaintiff's counsel. (JEC)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Design Basics, LLC. (JEC)
February 6, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2260452. (JEC)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against K.W. Signature Homes, Inc. filed by Design Basics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Basics, LLC v. K.W. Signature Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.W. Signature Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Twidwell
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Sean J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?