United States of America v. The Estate of Peter Sacchi et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Yellowstone County, Stephanie Sacchi Combs, The Estate of Peter Sacchi, Stephen Sacchi, Samuel Sacchi and Montana Department of Public Health and Human Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00026
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS FOR PUBLICATION Issued as to All Defendants. (JDR)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Publication of Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/3/2019. (JDR)
May 2, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #19 MOTION for Publication of Summons by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria)
May 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Publication of Summons Victoria L. Francis appearing for Plaintiff United States of America Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Publication, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Publication of Summons) (Francis, Victoria)
April 23, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria)
April 17, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Stephanie Sacchi Combs served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (EMH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 16 USM 285 Return Executed on 4/15/2019. Summons served on defendant Stephanie Sacchi Combs on 4/15/2019. (EMH)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Stephanie Sacchi Combs. (JDR)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Montana Department of Public Health and Human Services served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Stephen Sacchi waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 USM 285 Return Executed on 3/26/2019. (JDR)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Office of the Attorney General for the Montana Department of Public Health and Human Services. (JDR)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION between United States and Yellowstone County by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Yellowstone County waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Samuel Sacchi waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Francis, Victoria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Samuel Sacchi on 03/05/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 5/6/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Stephen Sacchi on 03/05/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 5/6/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Stephanie Sacchi Combs on 03/05/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 5/6/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Scott Twito, Yellowtone County Attorney on 03/05/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 5/6/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to State of Montana, Department of Public Health and Human Services on 03/05/2019 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 5/6/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Note, #2 Exhibit B, Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit C, Second Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit D, Assignment of Deed of Trust, #5 Exhibit E, Montana Death Record, #6 Exhibit F, Certificate of Indebtedness, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Estate of Peter Sacchi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowstone County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Sacchi Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Peter Sacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Sacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Public Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?