R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary of Labor et al v. Agri-Systems

Case Number: 1:2019cv00049
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:651 Occupational Safety/Health

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/28/2019. (HEG)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/6/2019. (JDR)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/2/2019. (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary of Labor et al v. Agri-Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?