Majusiak v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jeanne Majusiak
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00053
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Bifurcate Claims And Stay Bad Faith Discovery filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Crash Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Pl Discovery Requests) (Oblander, Stephanie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Bifurcate Claims And Stay Bad Faith Discovery Stephanie A. Oblander appearing for Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Oblander, Stephanie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Jeanne Majusiak. (D'Alton, William)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b )(1 )(B), the case is referred to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan, United States Magistrate Judge, who will conduct all necessary hearings and submit to the undersigned proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of all motions excepted from the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction by 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l)(A) Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/9/2019. (AMC)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Jeanne Majusiak. (D'Alton, William)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Jeanne Majusiak. (D'Alton, William)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the discovery requests or seek a protective order by July 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/28/2019. (JDR)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Discovery Responses or Seek Protective Order Relief filed by Jeanne Majusiak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5.8.19 email, #2 Exhibit 1st set of Discovery, #3 Exhibit 2nd set of Discovery, #4 Exhibit Kennedy Report, #5 Exhibit 6.10.19 email, #6 Exhibit 6.13.19 Initial Discl., #7 Exhibit 6.14.19 Supp Initial Discl., #8 Exhibit 6.18.19 letter) (D'Alton, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Discovery Responses or Seek Protective Order Relief filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Brief for Enlargement of Time- Counsel letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Brief for Enlargement of Time- PL Discovery Requests) (Oblander, Stephanie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Discovery Responses or Seek Protective Order Relief Stephanie A. Oblander appearing for Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Oblander, Stephanie)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion Attend preliminary pretrial conference by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/17/2019. (JDR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION Attend preliminary pretrial conference by telephone Stephanie A. Oblander appearing for Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motionotion) (Oblander, Stephanie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Stephanie A. Oblander, William D'Alton. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/20/2019. (JEC)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/9/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/9/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/9/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/29/2019. (JDR)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Majusiak v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Majusiak
Represented By: William D'Alton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?