Reece v. S8 Engineering, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Emily Reece
Defendant: Entegee, Inc. and S8 Engineering, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00054
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDR)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/4/2019. (JDR)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel John G. Crist, Elizabeth Mary Varela, Eric E. Holm, Roger G. TrimConsent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/20/2019. (JDR)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Entegee, Inc.. (Varela, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Entegee, Inc.. (Varela, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Mary Varela on behalf of Entegee, Inc. (Varela, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Crist on behalf of Entegee, Inc. (Crist, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by S8 Engineering, Inc.. (Trim, Roger)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Emily Reece, filed by S8 Engineering, Inc. (AEC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT FILE: DV-19-0428, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. Original file held in the clerk's office on the open civil case shelf. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (AEC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by S8 Engineering, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tessenderlo Group, NV, Corporate Parent Tessenderlo Kerley, Inc., Corporate Parent Tessenderlo USA, Inc. (DE) for S8 Engineering, Inc... (Trim, Roger)
May 15, 2019 Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2309785 (AMC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (CASE NUMBER IS CV-19-54-BLG-SPW-TJC) by S8 Engineering, Inc. from Yellowstone County State Court, case number DV-19-0428 filed by S8 Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Acknowledge Service of Complaint, #3 Acknowledgment, #4 Declaration of Tom Moriarity, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reece v. S8 Engineering, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Reece
Represented By: Eric E. Holm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entegee, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Varela
Represented By: John G. Crist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S8 Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Roger G. Trim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?