Pelatt v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc.

Plaintiff: Adam Pelatt
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00057
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2019. Motions due by 3/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/16/2019. (JEC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/16/2019. Order to follow. (SMD)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l)(B), the case is referred to theHonorable Timothy J. Cavan, United States Magistrate Judge, who will conduct all necessary hearings and submit to the undersigned proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of all motions excepted from the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction by 28 U.S.C. 636(b )(1 )(A). Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/10/2019. (AMC)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Intuitive Surgical, Inc.. (Gomez, Michelle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Adam Pelatt. (Holm, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Adam Pelatt. (Holm, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Adam Pelatt. (Holm, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/17/2019. (JDR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone for the July 16, 2019 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Michelle L. Gomez appearing for Defendant Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gomez, Michelle)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Michelle L. Gomez, Eric E. HolmConsent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/17/2019. (JDR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Intuitive Surgical, Inc., filed by Adam Pelatt. (JDR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT FILE: DV-56-2019-0000426-WS, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/9/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/9/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/9/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/31/2019. (JDR)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Intuitive Surgical, Inc.. (Gomez, Michelle)
May 23, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2314026 (JDR)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-19-426., filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Mailing Packet, #5 Exhibit C - Acknowledgement of Service, #6 Exhibit D - Summons) (JDR) Modified on 5/23/2019 (JDR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelatt v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Pelatt
Represented By: Eric E. Holm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle L. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?