USA DeBusk, LLC v. AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: USA DeBusk, LLC
Defendant: AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00063
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Clerk of Court notifying PHV attorney Elyssa J. Romino of CM/ECF registration requirements. Hard copy mailed. (JDR)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion Elyssa J. Romino to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/1/2019. (JDR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION Elyssa J. Romino to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2345445.) Matthew Albert Haus appearing for Defendant AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit) (Haus, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by USA DeBusk, LLC. (Soueidi, Joseph)
July 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: (Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/6/2019.), Reset Hearings:.( Pretrial Conference reset for 8/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan.) (JEC)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/18/2019. (JEC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Pretrial Statement and Stipulated Statement of Facts, and to Extend Time for Preliminary Pretrial Conference Joseph A. Soueidi appearing for Plaintiff USA DeBusk, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Soueidi, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. (AEC)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (AEC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew Albert Haus (Haus, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc., filed by USA DeBusk, LLC. (JDR)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT FILE: DV-56-2019-569-DS, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/1/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/1/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/1/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 11:30 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/17/2019. (JDR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel John H. Tarlow, Matthew Albert Haus, Jeffery A. Hunnes, Joseph A. Soueidi. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 7/1/2019. (JEC)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AECOM E&C Holdings, Inc. for AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc... (Tarlow, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.. (Tarlow, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2320052 (JDR)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-19-569, filed by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA DeBusk, LLC v. AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Tarlow
Represented By: Matthew Albert Haus
Represented By: Elyssa J. Romino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA DeBusk, LLC
Represented By: Jeffery A. Hunnes
Represented By: Joseph A. Soueidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?