United Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. v. Preferred Contractors Ins. Co. Risk Retention Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Preferred Contractors Ins. Co. Risk Retention Group LLC, Dwayne Anderson, A & P Construction & Development, Inc. and Robin Anderson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00065
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.. (Decker, Christopher)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Preferred Contractors Ins. Co. Risk Retention Group LLC. (Sweeney, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Preferred Contractors Ins. Co. Risk Retention Group LLC. (Sweeney, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Christopher Sweeney appearing for Defendant Preferred Contractors Ins. Co. Risk Retention Group LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Sweeney, Christopher)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Proof of Service filed by United Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.. on 06/13/2019. (Decker, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.. (Decker, Christopher)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Original and one copy mailed to attorney in Missoula) (AMC)
June 6, 2019 Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2320052 (AMC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by United Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. v. Preferred Contractors Ins. Co. Risk Retention Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Lee Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Contractors Ins. Co. Risk Retention Group LLC
Represented By: Adam J. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & P Construction & Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?