Gray v. Guyer et al
Petitioner: Travis Lorren Gray
Respondent: Lynn Guyer and Attorney General of the State of Montana
Case Number: 1:2019cv00070
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Mailed to Gray. (TAG)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS #4 in full. COA denied. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/7/2019. Mailed to Gray (TAG)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Travis Lorren Gray. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis granted. Judge Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan termed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/17/2019. Mailed to Gray (TAG)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Mailed to Gray with docket sheet (TAG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Travis Lorren Gray. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement) (TAG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Travis Lorren Gray. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Guyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lynn Guyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travis Lorren Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?