Agan v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Deidre Agan
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00083
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION Celia K. Douglas to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2372713.), #8 MOTION Nelson G. Wolff to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2372706.) by Anthony M. Nicastro filed by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C, #4 D, #5 E, #6 F, #7 G, #8 H, #9 I, #10 J, #11 K, #12 L, #13 M, #14 N, #15 O, #16 P, #17 Q, #18 R, #19 S, #20 T, #21 U) (Nicastro, Anthony)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION Nelson G. Wolff to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2372706.), #9 MOTION Celia K. Douglas to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2372713.) filed by BNSF Railway Company. (Nicastro, Anthony)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO RESCHEDULE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE and EXTEND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES. Rescheduling will occur following resolution of Plaintiffs motions for pro hac vice admission of Wolff and Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/3/2019. (HEG)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Russell D. Yerger appearing for Plaintiff Deidre Agan Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Yerger, Russell)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION Nelson G. Wolff to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2372706.), #9 MOTION Celia K. Douglas to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2372713.) filed by Deidre Agan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Yerger, Russell)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Celia K. Douglas to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2372713.) Russell D. Yerger appearing for Plaintiff Deidre Agan Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certification) (Yerger, Russell)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Nelson G. Wolff to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2372706.) Russell D. Yerger appearing for Plaintiff Deidre Agan Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certification) (Yerger, Russell)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/24/2019. (JDR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Russell D. Yerger, Anthony Michael Nicastro, Chad M. Knight, Steven T. Williams. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/30/2019. (JDR)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement; Joint Discovery Plan; Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/22/2019. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties, and any individual proceeding pro se, shall report to the chambers of the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge, at the James F. Battin Federal Courthouse, 2601 2nd Avenue North, Suite 5500, Billings, Montana on October 29, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. for the purpose of participating in a preliminary pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/10/2019. (HEG)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by BNSF Railway Company. (Nicastro, Anthony)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company. (Nicastro, Anthony)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. Original mailed to plaintiff's counsel 8/13/2019. (JEC)
August 13, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2351493. (JEC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company, filed by Deidre Agan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agan v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidre Agan
Represented By: Russell D. Yerger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Chad M. Knight
Represented By: Steven T. Williams
Represented By: Anthony Michael Nicastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?