Temple v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Paulette Temple
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00091
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 Remark - PHV attorney Tyler Coombe is now a registered e-filer. (JEH) Modified on 11/6/2019 (JEH).
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (McIntosh, Ian)
October 25, 2019 Remark: PHV Counsel Tyler D. Coombe has been added. Electronic notification termed pending CM/ECF registration. (HEG)
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman regarding the requirement of CM/ECF Registration. Copy of Letter and Order #17 mailed to Coombe. (HEG)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Mr. Coombe, within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order, files a pleading acknowledging his admission under the terms set forth above. S. Nagy notified to add attorney information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/25/2019. (HEG)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION Tyler D. Coombe to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2389150.) Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit pro hac affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (McIntosh, Ian)
October 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (McIntosh, Ian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 Motions In Limine Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 Miscellaneous Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Master and Short-form Pleadings (Combined) filed in the District o Arizona. (JDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Discovery Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Discovery and Privilege Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Deposition Designation Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Daubert Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Case Management Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 THE PARTIES' NOTICE OF FILING SUBMISSION REGARDING REMAND OR TRANSFER OF CERTAIN CASES filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-01005. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JDR, )
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to District of Montana via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/9/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/9/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/9/2019.]
April 1, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-1005-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/9/2019.]
April 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15331515 filed by Paulette Temple. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Temple v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Temple
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?