Beggs v. The Control Group Media Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Colton Wayne Beggs
Defendant: Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc. and John Does 1-100
Case Number: 1:2019cv00106
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/4/2019. (JDR)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Colton Wayne Beggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Dugger, Tyler)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc.. (Huey, Nathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Huey, Nathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Nathan A. Huey appearing for Defendants Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Huey, Nathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate PubRec, LLC for Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc... (Huey, Nathan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Tyler T. Dugger, Matthew B Gallinger, Nathan A. Huey. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/2/2019. (JEH)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Motion. Defendants shall file their answers or responsive pleadings to the First Amended Complaint by November 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/28/2019. (HEG)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated Motion Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Nathan A. Huey appearing for Defendants Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Huey, Nathan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Huey on behalf of Instant Checkmate, LLC, The Control Group Media Company, Inc. (Huey, Nathan)
October 28, 2019 Set Deadlines: Defendants answer due 11/22/2019. (HEG)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Colton Wayne Beggs. (Dugger, Tyler)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colton Wayne Beggs. Instant Checkmate, LLC served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Dugger, Tyler)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colton Wayne Beggs. The Control Group Media Company, Inc. served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Dugger, Tyler)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/15/2019. (JDR)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial Tyler T. Dugger appearing for Plaintiff Colton Wayne Beggs Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Dugger, Tyler)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Instant Checkmate, LLC and The Control Group Media Company, Inc. (JDR)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Colton Wayne Beggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)
October 8, 2019 Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2379977 (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beggs v. The Control Group Media Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instant Checkmate, LLC
Represented By: Nathan A. Huey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Control Group Media Company, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan A. Huey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton Wayne Beggs
Represented By: Matthew B Gallinger
Represented By: Tyler T. Dugger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?