Exxon Mobil Corporation v. AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation and Diamond Refractory Services, LLC
Defendant: AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc., Jonathan Parsons, John/Jane Doe Defendants 1 through 5, Thomas Bunting and Dan Stetler
Case Number: 1:2019cv00107
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 29 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Culver, Triel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 28 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.. (Nord, Eric)
December 4, 2019 Filing 27 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.. (Nord, Eric)
December 4, 2019 Filing 26 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.. (Nord, Eric)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/4/2019. (JDR)
November 26, 2019 Filing 24 Plaintiff/Crossclaim Defendant's ANSWER to #14 Answer to Crossclaim, by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Culver, Triel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 Electronc Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Eric Edward Nord, John R. Heisse, Laura B. LoBue, John William Edwards, A. Clifford Edwards, Triel D. Culver, A. Christopher Edwards. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/2/2019. (JEH)
November 14, 2019 Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/4/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/4/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/4/2019. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 11:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Timothy J. Cavan. (EMH) Modified on 11/27/2019 to correct Judge information and schedule(EMH).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Exxon Mobil Corporation answer to AECOM's Crossclaim due 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/4/2019. (HEG)
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Triel D. Culver appearing for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation, Cross Claimant Exxon Mobil Corporation, Cross Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Culver, Triel)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice, each of the parties bearing their own attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Crossclaim of Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation against Defendant AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc., however, will remain for independent adjudication. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/1/2019. (EMH)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bar their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/1/2019. (EMH)
November 1, 2019 Remark: PHV attorney John R. Heisse is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JDR)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. re #6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John R. Heisse (LoBue, Laura)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION to Dismiss by Diamond Refractory Jesse Myers appearing for Plaintiff Diamond Refractory Services, LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order of dismissal) (Myers, Jesse)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/4/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/4/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/4/2019. Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 11:30 PM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/23/2019. (JDR)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. (LoBue, Laura)
October 22, 2019 Remark: PHV atty Laura LoBue is now a registered e-filer and may receive NEFs. (JDR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Exxon Mobil Corporation by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.. (Nord, Eric)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (Notice of Judge Substitution) entered in State Court. (JDR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Complaint with Jury Demand and CROSSCLAIM against AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. filed in State Court by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (JDR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2019: #1 Answer to Complaint) (JDR).
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT filed in State Court, MT 13th Judicial District against All Defendants, filed by Diamond Refractory Services, LLC. (JDR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT FILE: CV-56-2019-1094-BC, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk of Court notifying PHV attorney Laura B. LoBue of CM/ECF registration requirements. (Hard copy w/Order mailed to L. LoBue) (JDR)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Laura B. Lobue. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/16/2019. (JDR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk of Court notifying PHV attorney John R. Heisse of CM/ECF registration requirements. (Hard copy mailed with Order.) (JDR)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - John R. Heisse. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/16/2019. (JDR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION Laura LoBue to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2383238.) Eric Edward Nord appearing for Defendant AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order) (Nord, Eric)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION John Heisse to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2383224.) Eric Edward Nord appearing for Defendant AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order) (Nord, Eric)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Notice to Clerk of Court (Nord, Eric)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.. (Nord, Eric)
October 9, 2019 Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2380337 (AMC)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (CASE NUMBER IS CV-19-107-BLG-SPW-TJC) by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. from Thirteenth Judicial District, case number DV-19-1094. filed by AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exxon Mobil Corporation v. AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: John William Edwards
Represented By: Triel D. Culver
Represented By: A. Clifford Edwards
Represented By: A. Christopher Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Refractory Services, LLC
Represented By: Jesse Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM Energy & Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Edward Nord
Represented By: Laura B. LoBue
Represented By: John R. Heisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe Defendants 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Stetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?