Fairhurst v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Grace M Fairhurst
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00116
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tyler D. Coombe for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, and C R Bard Incorporated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Mr. Coombe, within Fifteen (15) days of the date of theis Order, files a pleading acknowledging his admission under the terms set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/20/2019. (HEG)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION Tyler D. Coombe to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2417865.) Ian McIntosh appearing for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (McIntosh, Ian)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 12/4/2019. (JDR)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Ian McIntosh, Kelsey E. Bunkers, Paul Lincoln Stoller, John A Dalimonte. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/2/2019. (JEH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (McIntosh, Ian)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (McIntosh, Ian)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 Motions In Limine Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 Miscellaneous Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Master and Short-form Pleadings (Combined) filed in the District o Arizona. (JDR)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Discovery Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Discovery and Privilege Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 Deposition Designation Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Daubert Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Case Management Orders (Combined) filed in the District of Arizona. (JDR)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00196. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JDR, )
October 24, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Montana Ohio via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 10/25/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 10/25/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-00196-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 10/25/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16400289 filed by Grace M Fairhurst. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairhurst v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler D. Coombe
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Represented By: Kelsey E. Bunkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler D. Coombe
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Represented By: Kelsey E. Bunkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace M Fairhurst
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?