Montana Environmental Information Center et al v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, 350 Montana, Sierra Club and Wildearth Guardians
Defendant: David Berry, U. S. Department of the Interior, Lanny Erdos, David Bernhardt, Marcelo Calle, U. S. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement and Casey Hammond
Intervenor Defendant: Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00130
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion Susan M. Mathiascheck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/16/2020. (JDR) Modified on 1/16/2020: CM/ECF registration letter mailed to counsel on 12/24/2019 (JDR).
January 16, 2020 Filing 22 First MOTION Susan M. Mathiascheck to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2429036.) John C. Martin appearing for Defendant David Bernhardt Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement) (Martin, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC. (Reimer, Hadassah)
January 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Change Venue Hadassah M. Reimer appearing for Intervenor Defendant Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Reimer, Hadassah)
January 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Anne Hornbein on behalf of Montana Environmental Information Center (Hornbein, Melissa)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC re #15 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Hadassah M. Reimer (Reimer, Hadassah)
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC re #16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristina R. Van Bockern (Martin, John)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristina R. Van Bockern for Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/2/2020. (HEG)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hadassah M. Reimer for Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 1/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/31/2019. (HEG)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION Kristina R. Van Bockern to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2420886.) John C. Martin appearing for Intervenor Defendant Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristina R. Van Bockern, #2 Affidavit Certification Pursuant to Montana Rule of Professional Conduct 8.5, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristina R. Van Bockern) (Martin, John) Modified on 1/2/2020 to clean up text(ACC).
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION Hadassah M. Reimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2420241.) John C. Martin appearing for Intervenor Defendant Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hadassah M. Reimer, #2 Certification, #3 Proposed Order) (Martin, John)
December 26, 2019 Remark: A call was placed to Intervenor Defendant John C. Martin's office regarding counsel S. Mathiaschek. Clerk's office was advised that there will be a move for pro hac vice admission, as she does not qualify to be a member of this bar. (HEG)
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler P. Gilman regarding the requirements of CM/ECF Registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Susan M. Mathiascheck at address on recently filed Answer and Corporate Disclosure Statement. (HEG)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC. (Martin, John)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC. (Martin, John)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Intervene. FURTHER ORDERED: Westmoreland shall file its Answer and corporate disclosure statement, which is attached to its motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/20/2019. (HEG)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Brief in Support re #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jack Standa) (JDR)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene. John C. Martin appearing for Interested Party Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC's Answer, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 2 - Order Granting Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC's Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit 3 - Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) (JDR)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indian People's Action, Sierra Club, Wildearth Guardians, Montana Environmental Information Center, 350 Montana. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed / Proof of Service Upon U.S. Defendants, #2 Proof of Service Upon U.S. Attorney - Dist. of MT, #3 Proof of Service Upon U.S. Attorney General) (Hernandez, Shiloh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Sierra Club (Shoaff, Nathaniel)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathaniel Shoaff for 350 Montana, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Wildearth Guardians. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/19/2019. (HEG)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Nathaniel Shoaff to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2401486.) Shiloh Silvan Hernandez appearing for Plaintiffs 350 Montana, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Wildearth Guardians Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nathaniel Shoaff, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hernandez, Shiloh)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Original summonses mailed to attorney Hernandez for service.) (JDR)
November 18, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2400429 (JDR)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Lanny Erdos, Casey Hammond, U. S. Department of the Interior, U. S. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, filed by Indian People's Action, Sierra Club, Montana Environmental Information Center, 350 Montana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montana Environmental Information Center et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanny Erdos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: John C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelo Calle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indian People's Action
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Nathaniel Shoaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Nathaniel Shoaff
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 350 Montana
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Nathaniel Shoaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Nathaniel Shoaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Nathaniel Shoaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Westmoreland Rosebud Mining LLC
Represented By: Kristina R. Van Bockern
Represented By: Hadassah M. Reimer
Represented By: Susan M. Mathiascheck
Represented By: John C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?