American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida v. Cameron
Plaintiff: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Defendant: Mary Cameron
Case Number: 1:2019cv00138
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. Mary Cameron waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Dahle, Jared)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida identifying Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc., Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida.. (Dahle, Jared)
December 11, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2412916 (JDR)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mary Cameron. (Original mailed to counsel J. Dahle) (JDR)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Mary Cameron, filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida v. Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Jared S. Dahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?