Nicholson v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Lee Nicholson
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc. and John Does 1-4
Case Number: 1:2019cv00141
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Linda Lee Nicholson. (Miller, Andrew)
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Linda Lee Nicholson. (Miller, Andrew)
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Linda Lee Nicholson. (Miller, Andrew)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Browne, Ryan)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RESETTING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The PPTC currently scheduled for February 11, 2020, is VACATED and rescheduled for February 25, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the Courts conferencing system to participate in the Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/6/2020. (HEG)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Vacate /Reset Preliminary Pretrial Conference Andrew J. Miller appearing for Plaintiff Linda Lee Nicholson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Miller, Andrew) Modified on 1/6/2020 to add "Unopposed" (ACC).
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDR)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 STATE COURT ORDER dismissing defendant Adler. (JDR)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants, filed by Linda Lee Nicholson. (JDR)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants, filed by Linda Lee Nicholson. (JDR)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT FILE: DV-9-2019-86-DS, MT 16th Judicial District Court, Custer County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. Original file held in the clerk's office on the open civil case shelf. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (JDR)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Andrew J. Miller, Brian L. Taylor, Ryan Patrick Browne. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 1/13/2020. (JEH)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement; Joint Discovery Plan; and Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/4/2020. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties, and any individual proceeding pro se, shall report to the chambers of the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge, at the James F. Battin Federal Courthouse, 2601 2nd Avenue North, Suite 5500, Billings, Montana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/23/2019. (HEG)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Walmart's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Browne, Ryan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Browne, Ryan)
December 18, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2416595 (JDR)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart, Inc. from MT 16th Judicial District Court, Custer County, case number DV-2019-86, filed by Wal-Mart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholson v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Brian L. Taylor
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lee Nicholson
Represented By: Andrew J. Miller
Represented By: Paul W. Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?