Peterson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lloyd H. Peterson
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00142
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 Social Security Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's opening brief is due within 60 days of filing of the answer. Defendant's response brief due within 30 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, due within 14 days after defendant's brief is filed.Opening Brief due by 4/14/2020. (ACC)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 Administrative Record filed by Andrew M. Saul. (Moum, Sarah)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel John E. Seidlitz, Jr, Victoria L. Francis, Sarah Moum. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/24/2020. (ACC)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Moum on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Moum, Sarah)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew M. Saul. (JDR)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED: Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerks office shall immediately file Plaintiffs Lodged Complaint. The Waiver must be returned to the Court within thirty (30) days of the entry date reflected on the Notice of Electronic Filing of this Order. Copies provided to individuals via mail as directed in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service and Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons) (HEG)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Lloyd H. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (JDR) Modified on 12/19/2019 to remove LODGED text as complaint is deemed filed (HEG).
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Lloyd H. Peterson. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Sarah Moum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd H. Peterson
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?