D & F Sanitation Service et al v. Allied Waste Services of North America, LLC
Plaintiff: D & F Sanitation Service and Robert L. Dunker
Defendant: Allied Waste Services of North America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00023
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by D & F Sanitation Service. (Breitenbach, Joseph)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by D & F Sanitation Service. (Breitenbach, Joseph)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by D & F Sanitation Service. (Breitenbach, Joseph)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Allied Waste Services of North America, LLC. (McClafferty, Brianne)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED The case remains assigned to the Honorable Susan P. Watters for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l)(B), the case is referred to theHonorable Timothy J. Cavan, United States Magistrate Judge, who will conduct all necessary hearings and submit to the undersigned proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of all motions. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/15/2020. (AMC)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate as Presiding Judge. Mailed to Counsel Brianne C. McClafferty, William W. Mercer, Joseph Loren Breitenbach. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/9/2020. (NOS)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/7/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/7/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/7/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/20/2020. (HEG)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Allied Waste Services of North America, LLC. (McClafferty, Brianne)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT FILE: DV-20-0275, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JDR)
March 13, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2456505 (JDR)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allied Waste Services of North America, LLC from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-20-0275, filed by Allied Waste Services of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D & F Sanitation Service et al v. Allied Waste Services of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D & F Sanitation Service
Represented By: Joseph Loren Breitenbach
Represented By: Benjamin O. Rechtfertig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Dunker
Represented By: Joseph Loren Breitenbach
Represented By: Benjamin O. Rechtfertig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Waste Services of North America, LLC
Represented By: William W. Mercer
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?