Drange et al v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jodie Drange and Andy Drange
Defendant: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company and Does 1-100
Case Number: 1:2020cv00030
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Counts I and II, Second Amend. Complaint filed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Sheehy, Martha)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Counts I and II, Second Amend. Complaint Martha Sheehy appearing for Defendant Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company (Sheehy, Martha)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Andy Drange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Selik, Evan)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Second Amended Complaint erroneously filed May 6 2020 is hereby struck from the record. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/18/2020. (EMH)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Amended Complaint Evan M. Selik appearing for Plaintiff Andy Drange (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Selik, Evan)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan P. Watters: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 5/8/2020. (Law Clerk: J. Wolff), (JEH)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT re #15 Preliminary Pretrial Statement, by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sheehy, Martha)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Objection to Filings of 2d Amended Complaint without Leave. (Sheehy, Martha)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Remark: PHV attorney Evan Selik is now a registered user and can receive electronic notices in this case. (EMH)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STRICKEN FROM RECORD PER COURT ORDER E.C.F. #27 . AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Does 1-100, Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Jodie Drange, Andy Drange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Insurance Policy) (Warhank, Murry) Modified on 5/18/2020 to update docket entry(EMH).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Remark: CM ECF Registration letter mailed to PHV attorney Evan M. Selik to complete registration requirements. (S.N. notified to add attorney to database) (EMH)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Evan M. Selik's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/5/2020. (EMH)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION Evan M. Selik to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2476655.) conditional objection filed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Sheehy, Martha)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION Evan M. Selik to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2476655.) Murry Warhank appearing for Plaintiffs Andy Drange, Jodie Drange (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Evan M. Selik, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Warhank, Murry)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Andy Drange, Jodie Drange. (Warhank, Murry)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Preliminary Pretrial Statements shall be filed no later than May 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/4/2020. (EMH)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 Ps' Supp Claim, #3 Exhibit 3 MWFB Supp Approval, #4 Exhibit 4 MWFB Reconcile Summary, #5 Exhibit 5 Correspondence) (Sheehy, Martha)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Sheehy, Martha)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Pretrial Statement Murry Warhank appearing for Plaintiffs Andy Drange, Jodie Drange (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Warhank, Murry)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Sheehy, Martha)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Andy Drange, Jodie Drange re #2 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Plan (Warhank, Murry)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Sheehy, Martha)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Counts I and II of Amended Complaint filed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Sheehy, Martha)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Counts I and II of Amended Complaint Martha Sheehy appearing for Defendant Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company (Sheehy, Martha)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Jodie Drange, Andy Drange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complete Policy) (Warhank, Murry)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed in state court against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Jodie Drange, Andy Drange. (JEH)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATE COURT DOCUMENTS, file received electronically from Yellowstone County, Case File DV 19-1733. (Attachments: #1 State court documents, #2 Transfer receipt) (JEH)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal. (Sheehy, Martha)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Sheehy, Martha)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/1/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/24/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/1/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/26/2020. (EMH)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andy Drange, Jodie Drange from Thirteenth Judicial District Court- Yellowstone County, case number DV 19-1733. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Summons, #2 Exhibit B. State Complaint, #3 Exhibit C. Affidavit of Scott Dawson, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2461595. (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drange et al v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Drange
Represented By: Martha Sheehy
Represented By: Randall G. Nelson
Represented By: Murry Warhank
Represented By: David C. Dalthorp
Represented By: Evan M. Selik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Drange
Represented By: Martha Sheehy
Represented By: Randall G. Nelson
Represented By: Murry Warhank
Represented By: David C. Dalthorp
Represented By: Evan M. Selik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Martha Sheehy
Represented By: Randall G. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?