Harper v. Purple Innovation Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Harper
Defendant: Purple Innovation Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00038
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary pretrial conference set for 6/8/2020 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/14/2020. (EMH)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #4 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 9) Trevor D. Everett appearing for Defendant Purple Innovation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Everett, Trevor)
May 12, 2020 Remark: PHV attorney Phillip Fraietta is now a registered with CM ECF and can receive electronic notices in this case. (EMH)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 CM ECF Registration Letter mailed to PHV attorney Philip Fraietta. (EMH) Modified on 5/12/2020 Mailed with copy of Order(EMH).
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to admit Philip Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/11/2020. (S.N contacted to add attorney to database) (EMH)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Purple Innovation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Casey McGarvey) (Everett, Trevor)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Trevor D. Everett appearing for Defendant Purple Innovation Inc. (Everett, Trevor)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor D. Everett on behalf of Purple Innovation Inc. (Everett, Trevor)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2479154.) Colin M. Gerstner appearing for Plaintiff Mary Harper (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip Fraietta, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerstner, Colin)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Purple Innovation Inc. answer due 5/11/2020. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/29/2020. (EMH)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading Colin M. Gerstner appearing for Plaintiff Mary Harper (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gerstner, Colin)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/2/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/26/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/2/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/7/2020. (EMH)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Harper. Purple Innovation Inc. served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Gerstner, Colin)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Purple Innovation Inc.(Original with one copy mailed to attorney) (AMC)
April 2, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2464645. (EMH)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Purple Innovation Inc. filed by Mary Harper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Purple Innovation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purple Innovation Inc.
Represented By: Trevor D. Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Harper
Represented By: Colin M. Gerstner
Represented By: Paul W. Adam
Represented By: Philip Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?