Lashley v. Saul et al
Plaintiff: Sally M. Lashley
Defendant: Social Security Administration General Counsel and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00048
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel John E. Seidlitz, Jr, Victoria L. Francis, Frederick D. Fripps. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/29/2020. (ACC)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick D. Fripps on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Fripps, Frederick)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (HEG)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of Service) (Copies conventionally mailed to the Acting Commissioner of SSA, US Attorney General and US Attorney as directed in the Order.) (JDR)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT - IFP against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Sally M. Lashley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR) Modified on 4/16/2020 Order granting IFP motion entered and Complaint is deemed filed. NEF regenerated.(JDR).
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Sally M. Lashley Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lashley v. Saul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Frederick D. Fripps
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally M. Lashley
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?