Caekaert et al v. Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Camilla Mapley and Tracy Caekaert
Defendant: Watch Tower Bible and Tract Society of Pennsylvania, Inc., Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc. and Bruce Mapley, Sr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00052
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Caekaert, Camilla Mapley. Bruce Mapley, Sr served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. (Shaffer, Ryan)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Caekaert, Camilla Mapley. Watch Tower Bible and Tract Society of Pennsylvania, Inc. served on 5/5/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Shaffer, Ryan)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Caekaert, Camilla Mapley. Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc. served on 5/5/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Shaffer, Ryan)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/13/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/6/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/13/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 01:00 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/20/2020. (Copy Order mailed to pro se party Bruce Mapley, Sr.) (EMH)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Watch Tower Bible and Tract Society of Pennsylvania, Inc. answer due 6/22/2020; Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc. answer due 6/22/2020. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/20/2020. (EMH)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon A. Wilson on behalf of Watch Tower Bible and Tract Society of Pennsylvania, Inc., Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wilson, Jon) Modified on 5/20/2020 (EMH).
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from deputy clerk. Sent via email to Mr. Mapley. (JEH)
May 18, 2020 Remark: Pro se defendant Bruce Mapley mailed a pro se filing information booklet from Billings Clerks office. (EMH)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Defendant Bruce Mapley Sr. (Attachments: #1 Summons returned) (EMH)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bruce Mapley, Sr, Watch Tower Bible and Tract Society of Pennsylvania, Inc., Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc. (JEH)
April 24, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2473378. (JEH)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bruce Mapley, Sr, Watch Tower Bible and Tract Society of Pennsylvania, Inc., Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc., filed by Tracy Caekaert, Camilla Mapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caekaert et al v. Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla Mapley
Represented By: James C. Murnion
Represented By: Robert L. Stepans
Represented By: Ryan R. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Caekaert
Represented By: James C. Murnion
Represented By: Robert L. Stepans
Represented By: Ryan R. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watch Tower Bible and Tract Society of Pennsylvania, Inc.
Represented By: Jon A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Jon A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Mapley, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?