Ostwald v. Green et al
Plaintiff: George David Ostwald, Jr
Defendant: Tom Green and Nurse Lavato
Case Number: 1:2020cv00071
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner by George David Ostwald, Jr. (TAG)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by George David Ostwald, Jr. (TAG)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by George David Ostwald, Jr (TAG)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Ostwald with docket sheet (TAG)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by George David Ostwald, Jr. (TAG)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff George David Ostwald, Jr. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ostwald v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George David Ostwald, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Lavato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?