Montana Rescue Mission v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Montana Rescue Mission
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00075
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Montana Rescue Mission. (McGrady, Philip)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Montana Rescue Mission. (McGrady, Philip)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Montana Rescue Mission. (McGrady, Philip)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/11/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/11/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/11/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. See order for call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/30/2020. (HEG)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is REASSIGNED to Chief United States District Judge Brian Morris. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/29/2020. (JDR)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER WITHHOLDING CONSENT. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U. S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters and is REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/25/2020. (JDR)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic mailing of Consent: Magistrate as Presiding Judge. Mailed to Counsel Joseph Patrick Cook, John C. Heenan, Philip L. McGrady, Christopher C. Voigt, John W Harkins, IV. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/25/2020. (NOS)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed by Montana Rescue Mission. (JDR)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT FILE: DV-56-2020-0000262-BF, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JDR)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Harkins, John)
June 2, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2488635 (JDR)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company from MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County, case number DV-20-262., filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montana Rescue Mission v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Rescue Mission
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Cook
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher C. Voigt
Represented By: John W Harkins, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?