Hartsoe v. Order Issued by Deceased Judge C.B. McNeil, Issued on August 29th 2011
Plaintiff: John Hartsoe
Defendant: Order Issued by Deceased Judge C.B. McNeil, Issued on August 29th 2011
Case Number: 1:2020cv00107
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Mailed to Hartsoe (TAG)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING #3 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full. Objection #5 overruled. #4 Motion denied. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/26/2020. Mailed to Hartsoe. (TAG)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #3 Findings and Recommendations filed by John Hartsoe. (TAG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiff John Hartsoe (TAG)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by John Hartsoe. Judge Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan termed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 8/10/2020. Mailed to Hartsoe (TAG)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint. Mailed to Hartsoe with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL) (TAG)
July 17, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX100017291 (TAG)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Hartsoe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartsoe v. Order Issued by Deceased Judge C.B. McNeil, Issued on August 29th 2011
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Order Issued by Deceased Judge C.B. McNeil, Issued on August 29th 2011
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hartsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?