Shively v. Canyon Creek Memory Care Community, LLC
Plaintiff: Tana Shively
Defendant: Canyon Creek Memory Care Community, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00120
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Canyon Creek Memory Care Community, LLC. (Goe, Oliver)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/5/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/29/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/5/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. READ ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/11/2020. (EMH)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Canyon Creek Memory Care Community, LLC. The defendant has up to and including 9/23/2020 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/11/2020. (EMH)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Oliver H. Goe appearing for Defendant Canyon Creek Memory Care Community, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goe, Oliver)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tana Shively. Canyon Creek Memory Care Community, LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Oaas, Torger)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Canyon Creek Memory Care Community, LLC (summons issued and can be downloaded directly from CM-ECF for service). (EMH)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT / JURY DEMAND against Canyon Creek Memory Care Community, LLC, filed by Tana Shively, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Owen Daniel Shively. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH)
August 6, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2522615 (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shively v. Canyon Creek Memory Care Community, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Creek Memory Care Community, LLC
Represented By: Oliver H. Goe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tana Shively
Represented By: Torger S. Oaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?