Employers Mutual Casualty Company v. S.D. Helgeson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Defendant: Dale M. Smith, Does 1-5, S.D. Helgeson, Inc. doing business as Stan Helgeson Homes, Marie Smith and SKRM, Inc. doing business as Helgeson Homes
Case Number: 1:2020cv00123
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/30/2020. (AMC)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Employers Mutual Casualty Company (Berkoff, David)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/29/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/29/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 10:30 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/10/2020. (TXB)
August 7, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2523821 (JDH)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to S.D. Helgeson, Inc., SKRM, Inc., Dale M. Smith, and Marie Smith. (JDH)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against S.D. Helgeson, Inc., SKRM, Inc., Dale M. Smith, Marie Smith, and Does 1-5, filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers Mutual Casualty Company v. S.D. Helgeson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.D. Helgeson, Inc. doing business as Stan Helgeson Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKRM, Inc. doing business as Helgeson Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: David C. Berkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?