Acuity Insurance Company v. Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Acuity Insurance Company
Defendant: Paul Oakland, Jr., Timothy King and Oakland Improvements, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00129
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Dodd on behalf of Timothy King (Dodd, Matthew)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Acuity Insurance Company. Timothy King waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Zadick, Gary)
August 19, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2529490 (JDH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. (JDH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Timothy King, Paul Oakland, Jr, Oakland Improvements, Inc., filed by Acuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Pleading, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acuity Insurance Company v. Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Oakland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy King
Represented By: Matthew A. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Improvements, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Represented By: James R. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?