PSC Custom, LLC v. Hanover American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: PSC Custom, LLC d/b/a/ Polar Service Center
Defendant: St. Johns Corporation, Hanover American Insurance Company and Sector Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00132
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by PSC Custom, LLC(d/b/a/ Polar Service Center). (Warren, Adam)
October 16, 2020 Remark: Admitted PHV attorney Joshua Stadtler is now registered with CM ECF and can receive electronic notices in this case. (EMH)
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10.10.2019 Hanover Coverage Denial Letter, #2 Exhibit B - 7.29.2020 Tender of Defense to Hanover, #3 Exhibit C - 9.2.2020 Denial of Coverage Letter) (King, Martin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 Remark: CM ECF Registration letter mailed to admitted PHV attorney Joshua D. Stadtler with copy of Order granting PHV. (EMH)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Joshua D. Stadtler's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/15/2020. (S.N. notified to add atty to database) (EMH)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Hanover American Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against PSC Custom, LLC by St. Johns Corporation, Sector Corporation. (King, Martin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sector Corporation, St. Johns Corporation. (King, Martin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sector Corporation, St. Johns Corporation. (King, Martin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION Joshua D. Stadtler to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2558542.) Martin S. King appearing for Defendants Sector Corporation, St. Johns Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua D. Stadtler, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice) (King, Martin)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by PSC Custom, LLC. (Warren, Adam)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Vacate and Reset #9 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2020 is VACATED and RESET for 11/19/2020 at 2:30 PM. All other deadlines in the Court's #9 Order shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/15/2020. (EMH)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate and Reset Preliminary Pretrial Conference Adam J. Warren appearing for Plaintiff PSC Custom, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Warren, Adam)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/2/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/26/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/2/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. READ ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/11/2020. (EMH)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Hanover American Insurance Company's ANSWER to #4 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against PSC Custom, LLC by Hanover American Insurance Company. (Dahle, Jared)
September 1, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Hanover American Insurance Company initial appearance/answer due 9/4/2020. (EMH)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Appearance. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Hanover shall have until September 4, 2020, in which to file its Initial Appearance. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/31/2020. (EMH)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Appearance Jared S. Dahle appearing for Defendant Hanover American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Time to File Initial Appearance) (Dahle, Jared)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PSC Custom, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PSC Custom, LLC for PSC Custom, LLC.. (Warren, Adam)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Hanover American Insurance Company, Sector Corporation, St. Johns Corporation, filed by PSC Custom, LLC. (EMH)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT DOCUMENTS received electronically from Montana Thirteenth Judicial District- Yellowstone County, case number DV-56-2020-0000959-BC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Case File, #2 Signed Acknowledgment Receipt) (EMH)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hanover American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Hanover American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate OPUS Investments for Hanover American Insurance Company.. (Dahle, Jared)
August 24, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2531755. (EMH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hanover American Insurance Company from Montana Thirteenth Judicial District Court - Yellowstone County, cause number DV-20-0959. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons-Hanover, #4 Exhibit Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint)) (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PSC Custom, LLC v. Hanover American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Johns Corporation
Represented By: Martin S. King
Represented By: Joshua D. Stadtler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jared S. Dahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sector Corporation
Represented By: Martin S. King
Represented By: Joshua D. Stadtler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSC Custom, LLC d/b/a/ Polar Service Center
Represented By: Adam J. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?