Murray v. Saul
Plaintiff: Stacey Murray
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00140
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Staples, Jeffrey)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint Jeffrey Staples appearing for Defendant Andrew M. Saul Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Staples, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy J. Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel John E. Seidlitz, Jr, Victoria L. Francis, Jeffrey Staples. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/7/2020. (ACC)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Staples on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Staples, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew M. Saul. (JDH)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Notice/Waiver documents mailed to parties as directed in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice/Waiver Documents) (HEG)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Stacey Murray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed summons) (JEH) Modified on 9/29/2020 complaint deemed filed per Order #3 (HEG).
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Stacey Murray Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (JEH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Murray
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Jeffrey Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?