Esman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Niki Lee Esman
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00150
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Becia, Franco)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew M. Saul. (EMH)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service) (EMH)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER against Andrew M. Saul (Filing fee: IFP Motion Pending), filed by Niki Lee Esman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - US Atty, #3 Proposed Summons- Commissioner, #4 Proposed Summons- Attorney General) (EMH) Modified on 10/28/2020 (EMH)to remove text LODGED .
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis John E. Seidlitz, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Niki Lee Esman (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (EMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niki Lee Esman
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Franco Luciano Becia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?