Mraz v. American Medical Resonse Ambulance Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tyrel Mraz
Defendant: American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00155
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings (Including Joinder of Parties): 2/22/2021. Discovery Deadline (discovery must be served so that responses are due on or before this date): 9/22/2021. Motions Deadline (except motions otherwise scheduled): 10/22/2021. See order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 12/22/2020. (HEG)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 12/22/2020. Order to follow. (JDB)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Tyrel Mraz. (Braukmann, Michele) (NOS)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Tyrel Mraz. (Braukmann, Michele)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Tyrel Mraz. (Braukmann, Michele)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Tyrel Mraz. (Braukmann, Michele)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Ritchie, Jason)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/24/2020. (JDH)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial, Joint Discovery Plan and Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/15/2020. A telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference shall be held on December 22, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties are required to participate in the conference. Counsel shall use the Courts conferencing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/3/2020. (HEG)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Ritchie, Jason)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate as Presiding Judge. Mailed via ECF to Counsel Jason S. Ritchie, Michele L. Braukmann. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 11/16/2020. (NOS)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Ritchie, Jason)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc. from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-20-1236., filed by American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Acknowledgment and Waiver of Service, #3 Declaration of J. Nolan, #4 Declaration of R. Schult, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH) Modified on 10/27/2020 to correct file date (JDH).
October 26, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2564623 (JDH) Modified on 10/27/2020 to correct file date (JDH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mraz v. American Medical Resonse Ambulance Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.
Represented By: Jason S. Ritchie
Represented By: Michael P. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrel Mraz
Represented By: Michele L. Braukmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?