Derheim v. Tacoma Screw Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Derheim
Defendant: Tacoma Screw Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00167
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDH)
December 22, 2020 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. (JDH)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting: Telephonic Pretrial Conference RESET for 2/2/2021 at 02:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/21/2020. (SMD)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Mailing of Consent Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Adam J. Warren, Bruce F. Fain, Jacob N. Rebo. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/24/2020. (APP)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Tacoma Screw Products, Inc.. (Fain, Bruce)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Tacoma Screw Products, Inc., filed by Kenneth Derheim. (JDH)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT FILE: DV-20-1385, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JDH)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tacoma Screw Products, Inc.. (Fain, Bruce)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/19/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/19/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/19/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 02:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 11/16/2020. (TXB)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tacoma Screw Products, Inc. from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-20-1385, filed by Tacoma Screw Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH)
November 16, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2573358 (JDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derheim v. Tacoma Screw Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tacoma Screw Products, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Jacob N. Rebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Derheim
Represented By: Adam J. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?