Richey v. FedEx Freight, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas Richey
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00021
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Thomas Richey. (McGuinness, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Thomas Richey. (McGuinness, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Thomas Richey. (McGuinness, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Goe, Oliver)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER WITHHOLDING CONSENT. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Susan P. Watters. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/18/2021. (JDH)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement, Joint Discovery Plan and Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/22/2021. A telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference shall be held on April 29, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties are required to participate in the conference. Counsel shall use the Courts conferencing system. See order for call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/11/2021. (HEG)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand filed in State Court by FedEx Freight, Inc. (JEH)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against FedEx Freight, Inc. filed by Thomas Richey. (JEH)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT FILE: DV-21-0086, MT 13TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, YELLOWSTONE COUNTY. Case Register Report. (Attachments: #1 State Court documents, #2 Receipt) (JEH)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Magistrate as Presiding Judge. Mailed via NEF to Counsel Oliver H. Goe, Michael F. McGuinness. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/15/2021. (NOS)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Goe, Oliver)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedEx Freight, Inc. from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-21-86., filed by FedEx Freight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH)
February 23, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2621601 (JDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richey v. FedEx Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Richey
Represented By: Michael F. McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Oliver H. Goe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?