Redstar Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Eugene Chicco Redstar Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00039
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Cavan
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Goldoftas on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Goldoftas, Lisa)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT TO USMJ. (JDH)
May 4, 2021 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to Standing Order DLC-51 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. (JDH)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commissioner of Social Security. (JDH)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 Mailing of Consent Judge Cavan as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Eric Rasmusson. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/29/2021. (APP)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerks office shall immediately file Plaintiffs Lodged Complaint. Copies mailed to parties as directed in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service and Notice of Lawsuit) (HEG)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Eugene Chicco Redstar Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summonses) (JDH) Modified on 4/8/2021 Lodged text removed as complaint is deemed filed (HEG).
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Eric Rasmusson appearing for Plaintiff Eugene Chicco Redstar Jr. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (JDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redstar Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Goldoftas
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Chicco Redstar Jr.
Represented By: Eric Rasmusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?