McKee v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Adam R. McKee
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00126
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Referring Judge: Susan P Watters
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 SERVICE OF CONSENT to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form.Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/9/2022. (JLE)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Groebner on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Groebner, Benjamin)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Summons may be downloaded and printed by Plaintiff's Counsel for service.) (JDH)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Adam R. McKee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH)
November 29, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-2772579 (JDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKee v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam R. McKee
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Benjamin Groebner
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?