Miller v. Sunbeam Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Miller
Defendant: Newell Brands, Inc. and Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00009
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Filing 18 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc. re #16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (O'Connell, David)
March 11, 2025 Filing 17 Joint Stipulated Motion for Remote Attendance at Preliminary Pretrial Conference or, In the Alternative, Motion to Reschedule Conference. John W Harkins, IV appearing for Defendants Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Harkins, John)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David O'Connell. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/10/2025. (NOS)
March 10, 2025 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION David J. O'Connell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3441147.). John W Harkins, IV appearing for Defendants Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Harkins, John)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 11:00 a.m. at the Mike Mansfield Federal Courthouse in Butte, Montana. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/1/2025. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/1/2025. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/1/2025. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/24/2025. (NOS)
February 19, 2025 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice of Reassignment. Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1 and objection having been made to the jurisdiction of an U.S. Magistrate Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Donald W. Molloy. (SGN)
February 14, 2025 Filing 12 Individual Party Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form.
February 13, 2025 Filing 11 Service of Notification of Assignment to Magistrate Judge form. Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/27/2025. (JDH)
February 12, 2025 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure/Notice of Interested Parties by Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc. for Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Harkins, John)
February 12, 2025 Filing 9 Sunbeam Products, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Harkins, John)
February 12, 2025 Filing 8 Newell Brands, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Newell Brands, Inc.. (Harkins, John)
January 31, 2025 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Miller. Sunbeam Products, Inc. served on 1/23/2025, answer due 2/13/2025. (Kress, Adam)
January 31, 2025 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Miller. Newell Brands, Inc. served on 1/23/2025, answer due 2/13/2025. (Kress, Adam)
January 16, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Jason Miller (Kress, Adam)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam J. Kress. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 1/30/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/15/2025. (JDH)
January 14, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION Adam J. Kress to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3402199.). Teague J. Westrope appearing for Plaintiff Jason Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adam J. Kress, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Westrope, Teague)
January 13, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc.. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (JDH)
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Trial Demand against Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc., filed by Jason Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH)
January 13, 2025 Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AMTDC-3401960 (JDH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Sunbeam Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newell Brands, Inc.
Represented By: David O'Connell
Represented By: John W Harkins, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Represented By: David O'Connell
Represented By: John W Harkins, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Miller
Represented By: Teague J. Westrope
Represented By: Adam John Kress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?