Gilberti v. Gates
Plaintiff: Joseph D. Gilberti
Defendant: William Henry Gates, III
Case Number: 1:2025cv00019
Filed: February 7, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2025 Filing 7 USCA Case Number 25-1986 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph D. Gilberti. (TAG)
March 24, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order Dismissing Case by Joseph D. Gilberti. Filing fee $ 605 not paid. (TAG)
March 24, 2025 Filing 5 Objection re: #3 Order Dismissing Case filed by Joseph D. Gilberti (TAG)
March 6, 2025 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Mailed to Gilberti (TAG)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Motion to proceed IFP #1 denied. Any appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/6/2025. Mailed to Gilberti (TAG)
February 7, 2025 Filing 2 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 405 not paid), filed by Joseph D. Gilberti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (TAG)
February 7, 2025 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph D. Gilberti. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilberti v. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph D. Gilberti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Henry Gates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?