Stanfield v. State of Montana

Petitioner: Kerry Cornelius Stanfield
Respondent: State of Montana
Case Number: 2:2012cv00045
Filed: July 9, 2012
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Butte Office
County: DEER LODGE
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Referring Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Claims 1, 2, 4, and 5 are DENIED. The case is remanded for further proceedings on claim 3. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/8/2013. Mailed to Stanfield. (TAG, )
November 13, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Carolyn S Ostby on 11/13/2013. (TAG, )
February 25, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 41 in full. Stanfield's petition 3 for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/25/2015. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanfield v. State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kerry Cornelius Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.